This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/09/2023 at 10:02:39 (UTC).

CITY COCOA VS CHELSEA STILLS

Case Summary

On 02/02/2023 CITY COCOA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against CHELSEA STILLS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY COCOA HOUSING AUTHORITY

Defendant

STILLS CHELSEA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCABE WILLIAM J

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/02/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

02/02/2023: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/02/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY AND PROPER VENUE

02/03/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY AND PROPER VENUE

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

02/06/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/16/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

02/17/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S239248; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 166018931; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MCCABE WILLIAM J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S239248; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 166018931; Event Description: PMT: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: $185.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MCCABE WILLIAM J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY AND PROPER VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: EVICTIONS RESIDENTIAL; Disposition Date: 02/17/2023; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less