This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/29/2020 at 06:09:53 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA VS RAUL G WATANAVE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 CITIBANK NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAUL G WATANAVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

WATANAVE RAUL G

Titusville, FL 32780-6838

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MONTERO ANDRES

1133 S University Dr Fl 2

Plantation, FL 33324-3303

 

Court Documents

DEFAULT ENTERED

01/23/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

01/02/2020: ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

12/19/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/02/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/25/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

11/25/2019: MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCR: DEF FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docket(#8) MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING APPEARANCE BY PHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158321; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: FLYNN LAVRAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158321; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: FLYNN LAVRAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less