This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/09/2021 at 07:21:58 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA VS RAFAEL CADENA

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 CITIBANK NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAFAEL CADENA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

CADENA RAFAEL

Palm Bay, FL 32907-2940

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINEN DREW RICHARD

1133 S University Dr Fl 2

Plantation, FL 33324-3303

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

08/10/2021: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

07/13/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/07/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE

07/07/2021: NOTICE

MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

07/07/2021: MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/07/2021: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S199356; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 130217613; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LINEN DREW RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S199356; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 130217613; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LINEN DREW RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LINEN, DREW RICHARD