This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/12/2021 at 00:58:07 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA VS P VEERASAMI

Case Summary

On 07/31/2021 CITIBANK NA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against P VEERASAMI. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA

10967 Lake Underhill Rd Ste 125, C/O Mairim A Morales Esquire

Orlando, FL 32825-4454

Defendant

VEERASAMI PATRICK

Palm Bay, FL 32905-4414

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORALES MAIRIM A

10967 Lake Underhill Rd Ste 125

Orlando, FL 32825-4454

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON LEONARD W JR

Po Box 1295

Minneola, FL 34755-1295

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/14/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

08/18/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

08/03/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/31/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

07/31/2021: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S201148; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 131793532; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MORALES MAIRIM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S201148; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 131793532; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: MORALES MAIRIM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAIRIM A MORALES, ESQ