This case was last updated from Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/17/2022 at 12:08:53 (UTC).

CHRISTOPHER LUIS CUBILLOS JR

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 CHRISTOPHER LUIS CUBILLOS JR was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County - Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORGAN LAUR REINMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORGAN LAUR REINMAN

 

Party Details

Guardian Ad Litems and Petitioners

CUBILLOS CHRISTOPHER LUIS

Palm Bay, FL 32907-1801

RINCON ASHLEY N

Palm Bay, FL 32907-1801

COUTURE TARA

Melbourne, FL 32904-3602

Not Yet Classified

CUBILLOS CHRISTOPHER LUIS JR

Palm Bay, FL 32907-1801

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MONTAS KAREN M

1290 Us Highway 1

Rockledge, FL 32955-2712

SPIRA MICHELLE STEIN

4865 N Wickham Rd Ste 106

Melbourne, FL 32940-8303

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: MORGAN LAUR REINMAN; User: aks66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • Docket(#21) CLERK OF COURT REPORT TO COURT AMENDED ANNUAL VERIFIED INVENTORY WITHIN STATUTORY COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: PET TO APPROVE MINOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: REOPEN GUARDIANSHIP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • Docket(#19) CONFIDENTIAL PETITION TO APPROVE SETTLEMENT OF MINORS CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketREOPEN FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • Docket(#18) CONFIDENTIAL AMENDED INVENTORY OVER $25000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Docket(#17) CLERK OF COURT REPORT TO COURT VERIFIED INVENTORY NON COMPLIANT

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN $25K - $60K; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#7) CONFIDENTIAL APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN REGARDING MINORS CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#6) CONFIDENTIAL APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN REGARDING MINORS CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#5) CONFIDENTIAL PETITION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN REGARDING MINORS CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#4) PETITION TO WAIVE BACKGROUND AND CREDIT HISTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#3) CONFIDENTIAL PETITION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM REGARDING MINORS CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#2) OATH OF GUARDIAN, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • Docket(#1) OATH OF GUARDIAN, DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: GUARDIANSHIP; Judge: MORGAN LAUR REINMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SPIRA MICHELLE STEIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MONTAS KAREN M