This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/17/2022 at 10:29:05 (UTC).

CHRISTINE GAINES VS J FOSTER

Case Summary

On 01/17/2022 CHRISTINE GAINES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against J FOSTER. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GAINES CHRISTINE

Defendants

FOSTER JIMMIE

Batesville, AR 72501

BAD BOY INC

102 Industrial Dr

Batesville, AR 72501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENTINI MICHAEL R

7335 W Sand Lake Rd Ste 300

Orlando, FL 32819-5539

Defendant Attorney

ZAVALA LUIS F

2420 Lakemont Ave Ste 125

Orlando, FL 32814-6166

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/17/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/17/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/17/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/18/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/18/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/26/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/09/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/09/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

02/28/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

04/28/2022: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S212239; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 142087333; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $20.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LENTINI MICHAEL R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S212239; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 142087333; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LENTINI MICHAEL R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bad Boy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LENTINI MICHAEL R