This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/17/2022 at 12:09:48 (UTC).

CHARLES LEE HOPPING

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 CHARLES LEE HOPPING was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MORGAN LAUR REINMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MORGAN LAUR REINMAN

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

HOPPING PAULINE E

Cocoa, FL 32927-3123

FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

2727 Mahan Dr

Tallahassee, FL 32308-5450

PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER

951 N Washington Ave

Titusville, FL 32796-2163

INPHYNET CONTRACTING SRV LLC

C/O Dcm Services7601 Penn Ave S Ste A600

Minneapolis, MN 55423-5004

FLORIDA DIGESTIVE HEALTH SPECIALISTS

Bradenton, FL 34211-4930

Decedents

HOPPING CHARLES LEE

Cocoa, FL 32927-3123

HOPPING CHARLES L

Cocoa, FL 32927-3123

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

HINES ROBERT D

1312 W Fletcher Ave Ste B

Tampa, FL 33612-3330

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2022
  • Docket(#27) PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • Docket(#25) PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • Docket(#24) PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • Docket(#23) PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • Docket(#21) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(#19) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#20) PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#18) PROBATE STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S204268; Party: PT 1; Memo: EFILING # 134648473; Event Description: PMT: FORMAL ADMIN $25K - $60K; Amount: $400.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: HINES ROBERT D

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: FORMAL ADMINISTRATION < 60000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN $25K - $60K; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#5) DEATH CERTIFICATE - FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#2) OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION NO FEDERAL TAX RETURN DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: MORGAN LAUR REINMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INPHYNET CONTRACTING SRV LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PARRISH MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, ROBERT D.