This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/13/2020 at 13:36:15 (UTC).

CENTRAL IMAGING VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 CENTRAL IMAGING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PEYINGHAUS REGINA

CENTRAL IMAGING OPEN MRI INC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMICK PHILIP A

2210 Central Ave Ste 300

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712-1257

Defendant Attorney

RIVERA BELINDA T

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

08/26/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

PRIVILEGE LOG

04/14/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/29/2020: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/29/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

03/02/2020: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/05/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/31/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less