Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/26/2021 at 03:59:34 (UTC).

CENTRAL I VS PROGRESSIVE A

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 CENTRAL I filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE A. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CENTRAL IMAGING OPEN MRI INC

DAMBOWIC MARCY

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCORMICK PHILIP A

2210 Central Ave Ste 300

Saint Petersburg, FL 33712-1257

Defendant Attorney

TANYHILL MICHELLE RENEE

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

PRIVILEGE LOG

06/26/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/15/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

05/01/2020: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

02/21/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/19/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/19/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/19/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

02/19/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: JUDITH E ATKIN; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 20-01-B

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL IMAGING OPEN MRI INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANYHILL MICHELLE RENEE