This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 15:51:27 (UTC).

CAVALRY VS MICHELLE CAIRNS

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 CAVALRY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHELLE CAIRNS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO and JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

CAIRNS MICHELLE

Merritt Island, FL 32952-2768

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT DERYL G JR

Po Box 934788

Margate, FL 33093-4788

 

Court Documents

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

03/16/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/16/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

03/17/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

03/20/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

04/06/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

07/06/2020: MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

DEFAULT ENTERED

07/16/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

10/06/2020: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT RECORDED IN OFFICIAL RECORDS

ORDER TO COMPLETE FACT INFORMATION SHEET

10/06/2020: ORDER TO COMPLETE FACT INFORMATION SHEET

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

10/06/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

10/06/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: JUDITH E ATKIN; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#16) PROOF OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: MOTION FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: REOPEN:SMALL CLAIMS UP TO 5000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketREOPEN FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#15) MOTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 03/18/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S167361; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WAGNER HUNT KAHN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000; Disposition Date: 10/06/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT , DERYL G