Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 10:25:13 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV VS LUCIA WEEKS

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 CAVALRY SPV filed an Other lawsuit against LUCIA WEEKS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JUDITH E ATKIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JUDITH E ATKIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CITIBANK NA

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

WEEKS LUCIA Y

Palm Bay, FL 32908-4745

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSELL RICHARD A

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408-1615

Defendant Attorney

CASTELLANOS J NICHOLAS

3639 Cortez Rd W Ste 130

Bradenton, FL 34210-3157

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/31/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

03/31/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/23/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/12/2021: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/04/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

03/04/2021: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S190376; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 122492149; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RUSSELL RICHARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S190376; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 122492149; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RUSSELL RICHARD A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $8001 - $15000; Disposition Date: 03/31/2021; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: JUDITH E ATKIN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAVALRY SPV I LLC AS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CASTELLANOS , J NICHOLAS