This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/20/2023 at 03:23:52 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV VS AMY VANDERPOOL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 CAVALRY SPV filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AMY VANDERPOOL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH FRIEDLAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH FRIEDLAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

CITIBANK NA

Defendant

VANDERPOOL AMY B

Titusville, FL 32796-3471

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESEMAN MELANIE S

1475 Centrepark Blvd Ste 275

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-7446

 

Court Documents

CERTIFIED COPY OF FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

08/23/2022: CERTIFIED COPY OF FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

IMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

08/23/2022: IMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/10/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/12/2023: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2023
  • HearingPast Court Schedule; Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S237750; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 164439105; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: WESEMAN MELANIE S

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: B212216; Party: P 1; Memo: 05-2022-SC-043065-XXXX-XX; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ANDREU PALMA LAVIN SOLIS PLLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $5001-$8000; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 5001 - 8000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketIMAGES OF COURT FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CERTIFIED COPY OF FILE FROM FLORIDA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED ORIG PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: KENNETH FRIEDLAND; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less