This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/09/2020 at 08:53:39 (UTC).

CAVALRY SPV I VS HOLLY DANIEL

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 CAVALRY SPV I filed an Other lawsuit against HOLLY DANIEL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SYNCHRONY BANK

CAVALRY SPV I LLC

Defendant

DANIEL HOLLY

Melbourne, FL 32934-7681

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MANNO BRYAN

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408-1611

WALKER SHARON

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408-1611

 

Court Documents

PRIVILEGE LOG

04/02/2020: PRIVILEGE LOG

MOTION FOR EXTENSION

01/23/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/12/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/02/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2020
  • Docket(#13) AGREEMENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • Docket(#12) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO APPROVE STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRIVILEGE LOG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158291; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ABC LEGAL SERVICES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 06/04/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less