This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/13/2023 at 02:11:57 (UTC).

U S BANK VS JOHN A BARRY

Case Summary

On 04/28/2023 U S BANK filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JOHN A BARRY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT BLAUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT BLAUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U S BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

FIRSTKEY MASTER FUNDING 2021-A COLLATERAL TRUST

Defendants

BARRY JOHN A

TRSTE LLC

BREVARD COUNTY DINEY BRANCH 52 A LAND TRUST

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

CHATEAU IN PINES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

UNIFUND CCR LLC

SECRETARY UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT VETERANS AFFAIRS

TENANT 1 UNKNOWN

TENANT 2 UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSENBERG ANNA J

Defendant Attorneys

DUNIVAN BRYANT H J

PEREZ ALICIA

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/07/2023: ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

07/06/2023: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

07/07/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

07/06/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

07/06/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT

07/06/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT

DEFAULT ENTERED

07/05/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED

CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

07/05/2023: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

06/26/2023: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/28/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

04/28/2023: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

04/28/2023: LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/28/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/28/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/28/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

04/28/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

04/28/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

04/28/2023: CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF NOTE IN POSSESSION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: FCL-NON-HOMESTD 50001-249999; Judge: SCOTT BLAUE; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less