This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 09/21/2023 at 16:06:38 (UTC).

AMICA MUTUAL VS A SWEENEY

Case Summary

On 05/11/2023 AMICA MUTUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against A SWEENEY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT BLAUE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT BLAUE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMICA MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY

MERCER BRYAN

Defendant

SWEENEY ASHLEY GENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHILLER BRUCE H

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

05/11/2023: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/11/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

05/22/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

08/04/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/14/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

08/21/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S257603; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 179605992; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SCHILLER BRUCE H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S250177; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 172919362; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SCHILLER BRUCE H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S250177; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 172919362; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SCHILLER BRUCE H

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • Docket(#3) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • Docket(#2) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: SCOTT BLAUE; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less