This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/27/2023 at 11:03:52 (UTC).

STONEWOOD VS DEJUAN ROBERTS

Case Summary

On 05/23/2023 STONEWOOD filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DEJUAN ROBERTS. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STONEWOOD TOWNHOMES LLC

Defendants

ROBERTS DEJUAN

THOMPSON KATRINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIEGEL MATTHEW EDWARD

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/23/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/23/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

05/23/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

05/23/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

05/23/2023: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

05/30/2023: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

06/09/2023: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

06/09/2023: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS AND NON MILITARY

06/09/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS AND NON MILITARY

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

06/09/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

06/09/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

DEFAULT ENTERED

06/15/2023: DEFAULT ENTERED

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

06/16/2023: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

06/21/2023: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS AND NON MILITARY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AND/OR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2023
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: EVICTIONS RESIDENTIAL; Disposition Date: 06/16/2023; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less