This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/05/2023 at 00:02:07 (UTC).

CAPITAL ONE VS MARGOT E HALL

Case Summary

On 05/17/2023 CAPITAL ONE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARGOT E HALL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KELLY INGRAM. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KELLY INGRAM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAPITAL ONE NA

Defendant

HALL MARGOT E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERN DOMINIC M

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

05/17/2023: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

05/17/2023: MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/17/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

05/22/2023: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

06/16/2023: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2023
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • Docket(#7) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S250199; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 173406948; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: STERN DOMINIC M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S250199; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 173406948; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: STERN DOMINIC M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 2501 - 5000; Disposition Date: 06/21/2023; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY OTHER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Docket(#1) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: KELLY INGRAM; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less