This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/29/2020 at 06:19:22 (UTC).

CAROL R HURDEN

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 CAROL R HURDEN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

CLOSE PEGGY

Melbourne, FL 32901-8610

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC

Obo Citibank Na, 200 Coon Rapids Blvd Suite 200

Coon Rapids, MN 55433-5876

Decedents

HURDEN CAROL R

Melbourne, FL 32901-8609

HURDEN CAROL ROBERTA

Melbourne, FL 32901-8609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

LANFORD J SCOTT

3159 Alzante Cir Ste 102

Melbourne, FL 32940-7329

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#24) PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(#23) PROOF OF SERVICE WITH ATTACHMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • Docket(#21) CONFIDENTIAL INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#20) STATEMENT REGARDING CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#17) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#16) OBJECTION TO CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158234; Party: PT 1; Event Description: PMT: FORMAL ADMIN $25K - $60K; Amount: $400.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LAW OFFICES J SCOTT LANFORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: FORMAL ADMINISTRATION < 60000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: FORMAL ADMIN $25K - $60K; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#5) DEATH CERTIFICATE - FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONICALLY FILED (E-FILED) WILL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) OATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PROBATE; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less