This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/12/2020 at 06:31:29 (UTC).

CANUEL CHIRO VS UNITED SERVICE

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 CANUEL CHIRO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED SERVICE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELBOURNE CHIROPRACTIC SPINE INJURY CENTER

HELMBERGER JENNIFER

CANUEL CHIROPRACTIC MASSAGE INC

Defendant

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOAG ROBERT D

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorney

HEILMAN JOHN W

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602-5827

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/30/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/29/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/25/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

11/20/2019: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/20/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/20/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/20/2019: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 19-40-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S157775; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S157775; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: ROBERT DAVID HOAG

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS 501 < 1000; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less