This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 16:02:01 (UTC).

CANUEL C VS AUTO CLUB I

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 CANUEL C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTO CLUB I. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAQUETTE THOMAS

MELBOURNE CHIROPRACTIC SPINE INJURY CENTER

CANUEL CHIROPRACTIC MASSAGE INC

Defendant

AUTO CLUB INSURANCE COMPANY FLORIDA

C O Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

03/16/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/16/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/16/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

03/16/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

03/17/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/08/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO DISMISS

05/09/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/11/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

11/02/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

12/17/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 02:00 PM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $1501-$2500; Amount: 175.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANUEL CHIROPRACTIC MASSAGE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Auto Club Insurance Company of Florida is a litigant