This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 10/16/2020 at 18:46:48 (UTC).

C MEIMAROGLOU VS UNIVERSAL

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 C MEIMAROGLOU filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNIVERSAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEIMAROGLOU CHRISTOS

Defendant

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAPF GRANT W

2790 Sunset Point Rd

Clearwater, FL 33759-1503

Defendant Attorney

CHESTER JEFFERY E

491 Montgomery Pl Ste 2001

Altamonte Springs, FL 32714-3100

 

Court Documents

REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

05/25/2020: REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

05/19/2020: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/18/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

05/15/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/24/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/06/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/06/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/24/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/19/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/19/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/19/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/19/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:15 AM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#18) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REPLY ANSWER OR RESPONSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: INSURANCE CLAIM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less