This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/20/2020 at 10:27:59 (UTC).

C MEIMAROGLOU VS HERITAGE PROP

Case Summary

On 02/19/2020 C MEIMAROGLOU filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HERITAGE PROP. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MEIMAROGLOU CHRISTOS

Defendant

HERITAGE PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Chief Financial Officer, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRAPF GRANT W

2790 Sunset Point Rd

Clearwater, FL 33759-1503

Defendant Attorney

BUONAURO JESSICA C R

2600 Mccormick Dr Ste 300

Clearwater, FL 33759-1071

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/17/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/04/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

05/14/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/19/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/06/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/24/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/19/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/19/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/19/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/19/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:00 PM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; User: ajg90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less