This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/26/2023 at 14:08:03 (UTC).

C KELLY VS SANDRA BEAN

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 C KELLY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SANDRA BEAN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELLY CORNEILOUS

Defendant

BEAN SANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LENTINI MICHAEL R

Defendant Attorneys

PICKETT ROBERT M

JENNIFER MILLER BROOKS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

02/21/2023: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/21/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/21/2023: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/22/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

02/21/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

02/21/2023: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

05/11/2023: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/16/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/16/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S240754; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 167235130; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LENTINI MICHAEL R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • FinancialPayments; Receipt: S240754; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 167235130; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LENTINI MICHAEL R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • ChargeComplaints; Cause of Action: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less