This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/07/2020 at 08:10:56 (UTC).

C ESPOSITO VS A ESPOSITO JR

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 C ESPOSITO filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against A ESPOSITO JR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTINA SERRANO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CHRISTINA SERRANO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ESPOSITO COURTNEY LEANN

Respondent

ESPOSITO ANDREW R JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRSCHD-ADDRESS UNKNOWN-VERIFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docket(#19) RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • Docket(#18) INJUNCTION COPY OF ORDER RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:15 PM; Judge: CHRISTINA SERRANO; Matter Type: MOTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCAL:MOTION HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#17) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ISSUED (CIVIL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#16) INJUNCTION ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: MOTION FOR CIVIL CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: RO: DOMESTIC VIOL CONTEMPT/ENF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#15) INJUNCTION MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#5) INJUNCTION AFFIDAVIT REGARDING JUVENILE DEPENDENCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#4) PETITION FOR INJUNCTION FOR PROTECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#3) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#2) MEMORANDUM TO LAW ENFORCEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • Docket(#1) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketRSGN:COORDINATE DR CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE W/CHILDREN; Judge: CHRISTINA SERRANO; Description: RSGN:COORDINATE DR CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DOMESTIC VIOLENCE W/CHILDREN; Judge: ROBERT A SEGAL; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less