This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 11/26/2022 at 17:08:16 (UTC).

C CHAFFIOT VS NICOLE WEBB

Case Summary

On 09/14/2022 C CHAFFIOT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against NICOLE WEBB. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CHAFFIOT CRYSTAL JANELLE

CHAFFIOT JUSTIN

Defendants

WEBB NICOLE RENEE

Tampa, FL 33647-2681

RAISER LLC

1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-4405

UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC

1200 S Pine Island Rd, C/O Ct Corp System

Plantation, FL 33324-4469

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIRBY MICHAEL R

525 E Strawbridge Ave

Melbourne, FL 32901-4705

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

09/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

09/28/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

09/28/2022: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

09/14/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

09/14/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/14/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

09/19/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S230191; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 157374109; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $30.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KIRBY MICHAEL R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S230191; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 157374109; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KIRBY MICHAEL R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: AUTO NEGLIGENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RAISER LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UBER TECHNOLOGIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIRBY MICHAEL R