This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/07/2020 at 11:35:32 (UTC).

BREVARD VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 01/16/2020 BREVARD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALEXANDER JAMES

BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES PLLC

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Co Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra, Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

Defendant Attorney

ETTELMAN BRANDON

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/27/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/27/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

03/03/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/17/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

01/22/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/16/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/16/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#13) MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#9) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S162145; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RICHARD SHUSTER PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S162145; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: RICHARD SHUSTER PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less