Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/25/2020 at 10:42:21 (UTC).

BREVARD VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 BREVARD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES

BASSELL EMILY

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra, Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

Defendant Attorney

BENCH REBECCA LAWS

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/27/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/03/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

03/30/2020: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

02/17/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/30/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/23/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/23/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket(#14) MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S160439; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S160439; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT <100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENCH REBECCA LAWS