This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/21/2020 at 08:35:39 (UTC).

BREVARD PHYSICIAN VS VICTORIA

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 BREVARD PHYSICIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VICTORIA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MILLS CHRISTOPHER

BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES PLLC

Defendant

VICTORIA FIRE CASUALTY COMPANY

Po Box 6200, Co Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

Defendant Attorney

OCONNOR ALINA

8151 Peters Rd Ste 2005

Plantation, FL 33324-4051

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/24/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/11/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/27/2020: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/27/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/02/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 19-40-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158365; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158365; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less