This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/20/2020 at 10:23:44 (UTC).

BREVARD PHYSICIAN VS NATIONWID

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 BREVARD PHYSICIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NATIONWID. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LARSEN KAREN

BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES PLLC

1775 W Hibiscus Blvd Ste 215

Melbourne, FL 32901-2627

Defendant

NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY AMERICA

Po Box 6200, Co Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

Defendant Attorney

OCONNOR ALINA

8151 Peters Rd Ste 2005

Plantation, FL 33324-4051

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/10/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/28/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/13/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/02/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

12/31/2019: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/31/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/02/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • Docket(#10) MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketPTC CANCELLED PER AO 19-40-B

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158355; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158355; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 100 - 500; Amount: $80.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 03/10/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less