This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 10:36:50 (UTC).

BREVARD PHYSICIAN VS GEICO

Case Summary

On 10/22/2021 BREVARD PHYSICIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RHONDA E. BABB. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RHONDA E. BABB

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES PLLC

LORNITIS CHRISTOPHER

Defendants

GEICO INSURANCE COMPANY

P.O. Box 6200C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Registered Agent

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer As Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

Defendant Attorney

KONTOGIANNIS CHRISTINA

1555 Palm Beach Lakes Blvd Ste 1000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401-2328

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

10/22/2021: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

10/22/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

10/25/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/10/2021: AMENDED COMPLAINT

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/10/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

11/10/2021: SUMMONS NTC APPEAR UNSERVED/UNEXECUTED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

11/15/2021: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/02/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/10/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/27/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/29/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/31/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/31/2021
  • Docket(#20) MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • Docket(#18) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#16) MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • Docket(#11) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docket(#12) MOTION TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S207056; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 137123036; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S207056; Party: P 1; Memo: EFILING # 137123036; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT <100

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: RHONDA E. BABB; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KONTOGIANNIS CHRISTINA