This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/06/2020 at 08:27:10 (UTC).

BREVARD PHYSICIAN VS DEPOSITOR

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 BREVARD PHYSICIAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEPOSITOR. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SALACKA PAMELA

BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES PLLC

Defendant

DEPOSITORS INSURANCE COMPANY

Po Box 6200, Co Florida Chief Financial Officer Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

BENDER DAVID M

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

Defendant Attorney

SAINT-PIERRE NANCY J

8151 Peters Rd Ste 2005

Plantation, FL 33324-4051

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

03/06/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/22/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

JOINT STIPULATION

01/07/2020: JOINT STIPULATION

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/06/2020: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

JOINT STIPULATION

01/06/2020: JOINT STIPULATION

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/07/2020: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

01/03/2020: MOTION TO INVOKE RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/03/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/02/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158367; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158367; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: $300.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 03/06/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS > 2501-5000; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less