This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/20/2020 at 08:21:13 (UTC).

BREVARD PHYS VS PROGRESSIVE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 BREVARD PHYS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BANKS PEYTON

BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES PLLC

1775 W Hibiscus Blvd Ste 215

Melbourne, FL 32901-2627

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

C O Florida Chief Financial Officer Registered Agent, P O Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

01/17/2020: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

12/02/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158361; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158361; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS 100 - 500; Amount: $80.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 01/17/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less