This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/18/2020 at 06:27:42 (UTC).

BREVARD PHYS VS GEICO GENERAL

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 BREVARD PHYS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HENSCHKE SINCERITY

BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES PLLC

1775 W Hibiscus Blvd Ste 215

Melbourne, FL 32901-2627

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Florida Chief Financial Officer Registered Agent, P O Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUSTER RICHARD

1413 S Patrick Dr Ste 7

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-4374

Defendant Attorney

LEVASSEUR RICHARD

1000 Legion Pl Ste 850

Orlando, FL 32801-1000

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

08/26/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/26/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

08/27/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

09/17/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/17/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

JOINT STIPULATION

09/23/2019: JOINT STIPULATION

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

09/30/2019: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/01/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

JOINT STIPULATION

11/05/2019: JOINT STIPULATION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/12/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JOINT STIPULATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docket(#14) MOTION TO EXTEND TIME

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docket(#12) MOTION FOR RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S150848; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S150848; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: $55.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SHUSTER SABEN LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS < 100; Amount: 55.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BREVARD PHYSICIAN ASSOCIATES PLLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RICHARD LEVASSEUR