This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/25/2021 at 17:22:17 (UTC).

BMS CAT LLC VS PANDEY HOTEL

Case Summary

On 03/19/2020 BMS CAT LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PANDEY HOTEL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BMS CAT LLC

BMS CAT INC

Defendants

DOUBLETREE HILTON COCOA BEACH WATERFRONT

Tallahassee, FL 32301-0434

PANDEY HOTEL COCOA BEACH LLC

1201 Hays St, Corporation Service Company Ra

Tallahassee, FL 32301-0434

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSTOCK SCOTT W

350 E Las Olas Blvd Ste 1600

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301-4247

Defendant Attorney

TAYLOR MATTHEW N

Riverfront Blvd Ste 620

Bradenton, FL 34205-8841

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/19/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/19/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

03/19/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

03/20/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/24/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

05/04/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/04/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/22/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

06/22/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

07/09/2020: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

07/13/2020: ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF DISMISSAL RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 02:00 PM; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • Docket(#10) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S167575; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SCOTT W ROSTOCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Disposition Date: 07/13/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMS CAT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PANDEY HOTEL COCOA BEACH LLC is a litigant