This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 04/21/2020 at 09:45:18 (UTC).

BISHOP BUTTREY VS ADAMS HOMES

Case Summary

On 12/21/2018 BISHOP BUTTREY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ADAMS HOMES. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BISHOP BUTTREY INCORPORATED

Defendant

ADAMS HOMES NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC

3000 Gulf Breeze Pkwy

Gulf Breeze, FL 32563-5623

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KALMANSON BARRY

500 N Maitland Ave, #305

Maitland, FL 32751

Defendant Attorneys

EMMANUEL ROBERT A

30 South Spring Street

Pensacola, FL 32591-1271

WHITE ADAM J

30 S Spring Street

Pensacola, FL 32502

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION

03/18/2020: MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION

ORDER EXTENDING TIME

09/09/2019: ORDER EXTENDING TIME

NOTICE OF FILING

10/02/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/18/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

REQUEST FOR COPIES

07/31/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

AFFIDAVIT

07/15/2019: AFFIDAVIT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/01/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/18/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

REPORT OF MEDIATION NO AGREEMENT OR IMPASSE

05/17/2019: REPORT OF MEDIATION NO AGREEMENT OR IMPASSE

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCR: MEDIATION CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRIVATE CIRCUIT MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docket(#96) ORDER TO DISMISS WITH 20 TO AMEND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) ORDER GRANTING MOTION OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
126 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2018
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONSTRUCTION LIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketASM: LIS PENDENS TWO PAGES; Amount: 9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketASM:FORECLOSURE 50,000 OR LESS; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) LIS PENDENS RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER REAL PROPERTY 0-$50000; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION G; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KALMANSON BARRY