This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 10:20:48 (UTC).

BANK AMERICA VS R D MITCHELL

Case Summary

On 12/03/2019 BANK AMERICA filed an Other lawsuit against R D MITCHELL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK AMERICA N A

Defendant

MITCHELL RODNEY DONALD

Melbourne, FL 32901-8680

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANDREU JUAN G

815 Nw 57Th Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126-2363

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

02/23/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

02/23/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

02/23/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

DEFAULT ENTERED

02/04/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

01/26/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

01/26/2020: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

12/12/2019: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/10/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/03/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

12/03/2019: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

COVER SHEET

12/03/2019: COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

12/03/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2020
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S158960; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: APA COST IOLTA

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketASM: COUNTY CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING RULE 2.420 FLORIDA RULES OF JUDICIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less