This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/13/2020 at 00:14:56 (UTC).

B LINDERMAN VS REMEDY TILE LLC

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 B LINDERMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REMEDY TILE LLC. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE A BAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MICHELLE A BAKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDERMAN BROCK

Melbourne, FL 32904-8194

Defendant

REMEDY STONE TILE SERVICES LLC

1726 Grand Ave

Deland, FL 32720-2162

 

Court Documents

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

08/04/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

05/27/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

04/23/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

JUDICIAL DIRECTIVE (ACTION) ORDER

03/26/2020: JUDICIAL DIRECTIVE (ACTION) ORDER

ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

02/17/2020: ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

01/31/2020: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2020: SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 01:30 PM; Event Description: CAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Court Room Description: TITUSVILLE HISTORIC COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: MICHELLE A BAKER; User: mec84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 01:30 PM; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2020
  • Docket(#3) MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBT 1501 - 2500

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: E822396; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LINDERMAN BROCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: E822396; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: SMALL CLAIMS > 1501-2500; Amount: $175.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: LINDERMAN BROCK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR(NTA) ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SMALL CLAIMS STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $1501-$2500; Amount: 175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: MICHELLE A BAKER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less