This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/08/2023 at 07:29:25 (UTC).

B HUTCHINSON VS IKEA US RETAIL

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 B HUTCHINSON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against IKEA US RETAIL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUTCHINSON BETTY

Defendants

IKEA US RETAIL LLC

ECOBRITE SERVICES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MITCHELL JOE M III

Defendant Attorneys

MARTINEZ SHAHLA K

TUZZIO GERARD A

PENTON MADGGE BERGISTE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/29/2022: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/29/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/29/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

12/30/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

12/29/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

12/29/2022: ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

01/27/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

DISCLOSURE

01/27/2023: DISCLOSURE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/27/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/31/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

01/31/2023: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION TRANSFER RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

02/02/2023: ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION TRANSFER RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER REGARDING JURISDICTION TRANSFER RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#8) MOTION TO DISMISS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER 21-24 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketJudge History; Case Type: PREMISES LIABILITY COMMERCIAL; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less