This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 04/08/2020 at 07:36:45 (UTC).

B GREENWALD VS GOV EMP INS CO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2019 B GREENWALD filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GOV EMP INS CO. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID E. SILVERMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID E. SILVERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

B GREENWALD MEDICAL PA

STRICKLAND EMILY

Defendant

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

Fl Chief Financial Officer As Ra Dept Of Financial Services, 200 East Gaines St Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FLANAGAN THOMAS E 3

14280 S Military Trl Unit 8439

Delray Beach, FL 33482-5112

Defendant Attorney

LEVASSEUR RICHARD

1000 Legion Pl Ste 850

Orlando, FL 32801-1000

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/31/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

12/09/2019: ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

JOINT STIPULATION

10/30/2019: JOINT STIPULATION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

10/08/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/08/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

09/30/2019: SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/27/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COVER SHEET

09/27/2019: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/27/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

09/27/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • Docket(#17) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket(#16) MOTION TO COMPEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#13) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 09:00 AM; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Matter Type: PRE TRIAL CONFERENCE; Result: CR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCR: PRETRIAL CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketCAL:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS NOTICE TO APPEAR (NTA) ISSUED TO ATTORNEY VIA E-MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketASM: SMALL CLAIMS $100 - $500; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: SMALL CLAIMS; Judge: DAVID E. SILVERMAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less