This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 10:52:16 (UTC).

B GOMEZ VS L GUARDAS IMACELA

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 B GOMEZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against L GUARDAS IMACELA. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are C ROBERTS-GM K ERLENBACH and KURT ERLENBACH. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

C ROBERTS-GM K ERLENBACH

KURT ERLENBACH

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GOMEZ BEATRIZ RASO

Melbourne, FL 32934-3271

Respondent

GUARDERAS IMACELA LEONCIO

Titusville, FL 32780-9999

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:15 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: KURT ERLENBACH; User: dnm89

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • Docket(#17) ORDER SETTING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:30 AM; Judge: KURT ERLENBACH; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 08:15 AM; Judge: KURT ERLENBACH; Matter Type: HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: E818304; Party: PT1; Event Description: PMT: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: $234.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: GOMEZ BEATRIZ RASO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docket(#2) DOMESTIC RELATIONS FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Docket(#1) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: -409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketASM: DOM FILING FEE; Amount: 409.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketASM: CIR CV DEFER PMT FEE CLK; Amount: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Judge: C ROBERTS-GM K ERLENBACH; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less