This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/11/2020 at 06:46:59 (UTC).

ARCHANGEL VS WCG AVIATION

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 ARCHANGEL filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against WCG AVIATION. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T and MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARCHANGEL AVIATION LLC

Defendants

GARNER WALTER C

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937-3569

WCG AVIATION LLC

132 Martesia Way

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937-3569

UNIVERSAL AIR SERVICE LLC

132 Martesia Way

Indian Harbour Beach, FL 32937-3569

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FIELDS PRESTON J

11211 Prosperity Farms Rd Ste C301

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410-3400

Defendant Attorneys

ANDERSON GREGORY A

10751 Deerwood Park Blvd Ste 105

Jacksonville, FL 32256-4853

WHITNEY NICHOLAS P

10751 Deerwood Park Blvd Ste 105

Jacksonville, FL 32256-4853

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/11/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/11/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/11/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/11/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/11/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

02/11/2020: COVER SHEET

AMENDED COMPLAINT

07/01/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

06/24/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

05/29/2020: MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/05/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/09/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/11/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/05/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

03/31/2020: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/24/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BUSINESS TRANSACTION; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • Docket(#33) ORDER EXTENDING TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 11:15 AM; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: BUSINESS TRANSACTION; Judge: PRESIDING JUDGE DIVISION T; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less