This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 21:56:42 (UTC).

APONTE ARIS VS SOPHIA N GUYAH

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 APONTE ARIS filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against SOPHIA N GUYAH. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARIS APONTE

Atlanta, GA 30349-7919

Respondent

GUYAH SOPHIA N

Palm Bay, FL 32908-7543

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

JENTIS WAYNE F

1900 S Harbor City Blvd Ste 315

Melbourne, FL 32901-4762

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2019
  • Docket(#14) ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • Docket(#13) SUPPORT GUIDELINE WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • Docket(#12) JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • Docket(#11) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S148965; Party: PT1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: EAST COAST LAW PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S148965; Party: PT1; Event Description: PMT: PATERNITY; Amount: $301.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: EAST COAST LAW PA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PATERNITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING PARENTING COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketASM: PATERNITY; Amount: 301.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docket(#7) ATTESTATION REGARDING READING ADMINISTRATIVE ORDERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docket(#5) UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AFFIDAVIT (UCCJA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docket(#2) PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: PATERNITY/DISESTABLISHMENT PAT; Judge: C SERRANO - GM L CASTALDI; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less