Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 02/24/2021 at 14:11:23 (UTC).

ANTONIO MOORE VS ROBERT DIBBEN

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 ANTONIO MOORE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROBERT DIBBEN. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE ANTONIO

Defendant

DIBBEN ROBERT S

Cocoa, FL 32927-3211

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHEPPARD ORLANDO

2886 S Osceola Ave

Orlando, FL 32806-5431

Defendant Attorneys

STRATIS-MALAK NATALIE

250 S Orange Ave Ste 600

Orlando, FL 32801-3443

POPRAWSKI SEBASTIAN KAZIMIERZ

301 Se Ocean Blvd Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994-2209

MCLAUGHLIN BRYAN D

301 Se Ocean Blvd Ste 205

Stuart, FL 34994-2209

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/10/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/17/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/17/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/17/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/27/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COVER SHEET

01/22/2020: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/22/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/22/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/22/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT COMPLETE AGREEMENT OR SETTLED

04/17/2020: MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT COMPLETE AGREEMENT OR SETTLED

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

04/15/2020: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

04/02/2020: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

03/27/2020: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/27/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

JOINT STIPULATION OR MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

03/18/2020: JOINT STIPULATION OR MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

03/10/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE CASE IS READY FOR TRIAL

03/06/2020: NOTICE CASE IS READY FOR TRIAL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

02/17/2020: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT COMPLETE AGREEMENT OR SETTLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF CONCILIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 10:15 AM; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Matter Type: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Result: CR: CASE MGMNT CONF CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Disposition Date: 06/01/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheppard, Orlando