This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/04/2020 at 06:40:06 (UTC).

ANNA MICK VS CITY MELBOURNE

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 ANNA MICK filed an Other lawsuit against CITY MELBOURNE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE B. TURNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE B. TURNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICK ANNA

Defendants

FLORIDA FARM BUREAU GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-4201

MELBOURNE CITY

900 E Strawbridge Ave

Melbourne, FL 32901-4779

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCCARVILLE RYAN

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorneys

TURNER SCOTT A

1180 Highway A1A

Satellite Beach, FL 32937-2479

MCAVOY MEREDITH L

Po Box 2928

Orlando, FL 32802-2928

 

Court Documents

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

02/12/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/31/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/31/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

07/29/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

07/29/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

07/28/2020: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF HEARING

07/28/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/05/2020: CROSS NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/04/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

05/28/2020: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/03/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO DISMISS

03/02/2020: MOTION TO DISMISS

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2020
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 08:30 AM; Event Description: CAL:HEARING; Court Room Description: MELBOURNE COURTHOUSE; Judge Name: GEORGE B. TURNER; User: mec84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#27) AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: GEORGE B. TURNER; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less