This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 07/19/2020 at 14:59:49 (UTC).

ANDRES GONZALEZ VS ERICK SANZ

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 ANDRES GONZALEZ filed an Other lawsuit against ERICK SANZ. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are JAMES H EARP and MICHELLE NABERHAUS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

JAMES H EARP

MICHELLE NABERHAUS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALEZ ANDRES

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

C/O Chief Financial Officer Ra, 200 E Gaines St

Tallahassee, FL 32399-6502

SANZ ERICK

Melbourne, FL 32904-9592

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILLENWATER GRANT R

940 S Harbor City Blvd

Melbourne, FL 32901-1909

Defendant Attorneys

WISEBERG PHILIP B

11300 Us Highway 1 Ste 300

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-3236

KNIGHT KEVIN

332 N Magnolia Ave

Orlando, FL 32801-1609

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/17/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/15/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/15/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/15/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/15/2020: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

01/15/2020: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/15/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/15/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COVER SHEET

01/15/2020: COVER SHEET

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

07/06/2020: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

05/11/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

05/01/2020: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/21/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

04/13/2020: NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

04/14/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR COPIES

04/03/2020: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/31/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/31/2020: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • HearingCourt Schedule: Court Time: 09:00 AM; Event Description: CAL:JURY TRIAL; Court Room Description: MOORE JUSTICE CENTER; Judge Name: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; User: mpb85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketCAL:JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER JOINT PRE TRIAL STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: MICHELLE NABERHAUS; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) NOTICE OR CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
53 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less