This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 01/22/2022 at 11:37:51 (UTC).

ANDREA HOMERY VS C SANCHEZ

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 ANDREA HOMERY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against C SANCHEZ. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGE T PAULK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGE T PAULK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOMERY ANDREA

Defendants

SANCHEZ CELESTINO LORENZO

Okeechobee, FL 34974

DREXEL METALS INC

801 Us Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-3811

SUNLAST METAL

North Palm Beach, FL 33408-3811

CARLISLE COMPANIES INC

3260 N Hayden Rd Ste 210

Scottsdale, AZ 85251-6651

ENTERPRISE LEASING COMPANY FLORIDA LLC

1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-4413

ENTERPRISE RENT CAR ENTERPRISE RENT TRUCK NATIONAL CAR RENTA

1200 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324-4413

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORAN MARY K

C/O Morgan And Morgan Pa20 N Orange Ave Ste 1600

Orlando, FL 32801-4624

Defendant Attorneys

DUFF JUSTIN T

100 S Ashley Dr Ste 600

Tampa, FL 33602-5300

EDMOND REGINALD A

100 N Tampa Street Suite 2605

Tampa, FL 33602-

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

09/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/12/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/12/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/25/2021: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/30/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/30/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

09/30/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

07/21/2021: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

07/15/2021: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/15/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

06/15/2021: NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

06/15/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/07/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/07/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/07/2021: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • Docket(#17) ORDER EXTENDING TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#11) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT ADDITIONAL DEFS; Amount: 2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: AUTO NEGLIGENCE; Judge: GEORGE T PAULK; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DREXEL METALS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CARLISLE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Enterprise Leasing Company of Florida LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORAN, MARY KATHLEEN