This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 03/27/2020 at 09:24:23 (UTC).

ANAMARY GASTELUA VS SECURITY

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 ANAMARY GASTELUA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SECURITY. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DAVID DUGAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DAVID DUGAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GASTELUA ANAMARY

MARTINEZ JUAN M

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Co Department Financial Services, Po Box 6200, 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32314-6200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PATRICK MICHAEL P

420 S Orange Ave Ste 140

Orlando, FL 32801-4935

PEREZ ALICIA

420 S Orange Ave Ste 140

Orlando, FL 32801-4935

Defendant Attorney

WEBER LAUREN J

200 East Las Olas Boulevard Suite 1500

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

01/15/2020: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/12/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/03/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/03/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/27/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/22/2019: AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

10/10/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

09/10/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

09/06/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

09/06/2019: COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • Docket(#15) MOTION FOR EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ATTORNEY OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • Docket(#7) MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S151583; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SCOT STREMS ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S151583; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: $401.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SCOT STREMS ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: CONTRACT & INDEBTEDNESS; Judge: DAVID DUGAN; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less