This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 05/27/2020 at 08:32:47 (UTC).

AMERICANA RES VS ROBERT BURKE

Case Summary

On 11/25/2019 AMERICANA RES filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against ROBERT BURKE. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICANA RESORTS CO-OP INC

Defendant

BURKE ROBERT

Rockledge, FL 32955-5923

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOHNE KARL W JR

1311 Bedford Dr

Melbourne, FL 32940-1975

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

03/12/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/04/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING

AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

02/26/2020: AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS OR AMOUNT DUE

NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION

02/03/2020: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION

FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

01/27/2020: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

NOTICE OF ACTION

01/15/2020: NOTICE OF ACTION

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

11/25/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/25/2019: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

11/25/2019: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

02/26/2020: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS

02/26/2020: ATTORNEY AFFIDAVIT REGARDING FEES, TIME, AND-OR COSTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

02/26/2020: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

02/10/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/04/2020: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE

01/28/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

01/09/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/03/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/02/2020: AMENDED COMPLAINT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingPast Court Schedule: Time: 02:45 PM; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Matter Type: HEARING; Result: CR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCR: HEARING HEARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION RECORDED IN THE OFFICIAL RECORDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketALL REOPEN COMPL EVENTS CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketCAL:HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT COUNT II AND III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: REOPEN: COUNTY EVICTION; Disposition Date: 03/12/2020; Disposition Description: CIV/FAM-ALL REOPEN EVNT CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketREOPEN FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S157854; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: $185.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KARL W BOHNE JR ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2019
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S157854; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: KARL W BOHNE JR ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: EVICTION; Disposition Date: 01/27/2020; Disposition Description: DISPOSED BY DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketASM: EVICTION FILING FEE; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY EVICTION; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less