This case was last updated from Brevard County Courts on 08/21/2020 at 11:59:16 (UTC).

AMERICAN VS ANTHONY P DEAL

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 AMERICAN filed an Other lawsuit against ANTHONY P DEAL. This case was filed in Brevard County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Brevard County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK

4315 S 2700 West

Salt Lake City, UT 84184

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendants

DEAL ANTHONY

Rockledge, FL 32955-6907

DEAL ANTHONY P

Rockledge, FL 32955-6907

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MODLIN SCOTT E

1551 Sawgrass Corporate Pkwy Ste 110

Sunrise, FL 33323-2832

Defendant Attorney

STEELE ANDREW C

1625 S Washington Ave Suite D

Titusville, FL 32780

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL

04/22/2020: NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

03/25/2020: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

03/05/2020: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

02/05/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

COVER SHEET

01/31/2020: COVER SHEET

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/31/2020: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT OR PETITION

01/31/2020: COMPLAINT OR PETITION

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2020
  • Docket(#11) ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#10) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT OR STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • Docket(#6) REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163416; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: $10.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SCOTT E MODLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2020
  • FinancialPayments: Receipt: S163416; Party: P 1; Event Description: PMT: CO CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Amount: $400.00; Payment Type: REGULAR CASH; Received From: SCOTT E MODLIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: COUNTY CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Disposition Date: 07/07/2020; Disposition Description: DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: ISSUE COUNTY SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketASM: CO CIVIL $15001 - $30000; Amount: 400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: COUNTY CIVIL; Judge: BENJAMIN B GARAGOZLO; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less