This case was last updated from Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County on 04/19/2020 at 07:11:48 (UTC).

ACAR LEASING LTD VS C LANDEN

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 ACAR LEASING LTD filed an Other lawsuit against C LANDEN. This case was filed in Eighteenth Circuit Courts - Brevard County, Not Classified By Court located in Brevard, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES H EARP. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************X-XX

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Brevard, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES H EARP

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GM FINANCIAL LEASING

ACAR LEASING LTD

Defendant

LANDEN CARRIE

Merritt Island, FL 32953-6507

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ECHOLS BERT

1000 Ridgeway Loop Rd Ste 200

Memphis, TN 38120-4036

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

09/24/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

10/08/2018: RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

04/09/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED VIA E-MAIL TO ATTORNEY

PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/06/2018: PROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL DISPOSITION UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Docket(#6) ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • DocketLACK OF PROSECUTION ELIGIBLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Judge: JAMES H EARP; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • DocketRSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2019
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS; Description: RSGN: CASELOAD REASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketTO BE REASSIGNED TO JUDGE ROBERTS AS OF 01-01-2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2018
  • ChargeComplaints: Cause of Action: REPLEVIN; Disposition Date: 09/24/2019; Disposition Description: DISMISS BEFORE HRG-OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketORIGINAL FILING UPDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT REPLEVIN; Amount: 85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketASM: ISSUE CIRCUIT SUMMONS; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketASM: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING FEE; Amount: 401.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Docket(#3) MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT OR PETITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketJudge History: Case Type: OTHER CIRCUIT CIVIL; Judge: CHARLES J ROBERTS; Description: INITIAL ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DBA GM Financial Leasing Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where ACAR LEASING LTD. AKA GM FINANCIAL LEASING LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ECHOLS BERT